There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy and Environmental Security Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend and modify tax incentives for ethanol, to establish minimum oxygen content of motor fuels in carbon monoxide nonattainment areas, to require a study of the environmental impacts of aromatic compounds in gasoline and the benefits of using ethanol in motor fuels, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/29/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/05/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/31/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/29/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (93)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/01/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/01/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 02/01/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 02/01/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/01/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/01/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/07/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/07/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/07/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/22/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/22/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/22/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/22/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/28/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 02/28/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/28/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/28/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/28/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/28/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/12/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/12/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/12/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 03/12/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/12/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 03/12/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/12/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 03/12/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/12/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/15/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/15/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/15/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 03/15/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/15/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 03/15/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/29/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/29/1990
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/29/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/29/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/29/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/29/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/29/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/29/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 03/29/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/29/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 04/04/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/19/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/19/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/23/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/23/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/23/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/27/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/27/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 07/27/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/12/1990
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 09/12/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/19/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/19/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/29/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade01/31/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/29/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power03/05/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/05/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3906.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3906. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/1990)

Energy and Environmental Security Act of 1990 - Title I: Extension and Modification of Tax Incentives for Ethanol - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend excise tax reductions for specified alcohol fuel mixtures for nine years. Directs the U.S. Comptroller General to study the options for reimbursing the Highway Trust Fund for the reduction in its receipts due to such reductions.

Extends a tax credit for alcohol fuels to December 31, 2002. Prohibits carryovers of such credits after 2004. Extends such credits to alcohol used to produce ethyl tertiary butyl ether (ETBE).

Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to extend: (1) the tariff treatment for ethanol to ETBE; and (2) the effective period of the temporary duty on ethanol to December 31, 2002.

Title II: Oxygenated Fuels and Aromatic Compounds - Amends the Clean Air Act to prohibit, during October to March of each year, the introduction into commerce in any carbon monoxide nonattainment area of gasoline with an oxygen content of less than 3.1 percent. Provides for the exchange of oxygen credits between sellers of fuels with an oxygen content higher than required and other sellers of fuels to offset the use of fuels with a lower content than required. Prohibits such exchanges between sellers in different nonattainment areas. Requires retailers of oxygenated fuels to label fuel dispensing systems with a notice that the fuel is oxygenated and will reduce carbon monoxide emissions.

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to develop environmental profiles for each of the aromatic compounds in gasoline and to take action to limit the use of such compounds in accordance with the profiles.

Title III: Development and Use of Ethanol - Requires the Secretary of Energy to: (1) give funding priority to ethanol development projects that have high potential for immediate benefits; and (2) establish a program to promote the development and use of ethanol in motor fuel.