Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 01/29/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/01/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/01/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 02/01/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 02/01/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/01/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/01/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/07/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/07/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/07/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/22/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/22/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/22/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/22/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/28/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 02/28/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/28/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/28/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/28/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/28/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/12/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/12/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/12/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 03/12/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/12/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 03/12/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/12/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 03/12/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/12/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/15/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/15/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/15/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 03/15/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/15/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 03/15/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/29/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/29/1990
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/29/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/29/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/29/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/29/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/29/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/29/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 03/29/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/29/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 04/04/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/19/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/19/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/23/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/23/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/23/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/27/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/27/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 07/27/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/12/1990
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 09/12/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/19/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/19/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/1990