Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/31/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 02/06/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/06/1990
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 03/20/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/18/1990