Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 01/31/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/31/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 01/31/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 01/31/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/06/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/21/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/21/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 02/21/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/20/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 03/20/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 03/20/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/20/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 03/20/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/20/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 03/20/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/03/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/03/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/03/1990
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/03/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/04/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/18/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/18/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 05/01/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/01/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/02/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/08/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/08/1990
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/08/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/08/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/08/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/17/1990
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 06/05/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 06/11/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/26/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/19/1990