Refine your search

Refined by:

Connecticut Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/31/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/03/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/03/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/04/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 05/01/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/1990