Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/31/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/06/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/06/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 02/21/1990
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/03/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 04/03/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/03/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 04/03/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/03/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/09/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/17/1990
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 05/17/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/17/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/12/1990