Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 02/06/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/06/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/03/1990
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 04/03/1990
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/19/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/12/1990