Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 02/06/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/06/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/20/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 03/20/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/01/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/01/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/01/1990
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 05/08/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 05/08/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/12/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/20/1990