Refine your search

Refined by:

Indiana Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/06/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/06/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/03/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/03/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/24/1990