Refine your search

Refined by:

Kentucky Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 01/31/1990
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 04/03/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 04/04/1990
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/17/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/07/1990