Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/31/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/06/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/21/1990
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/06/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/20/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/03/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/03/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/11/1990