Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/21/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/20/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/03/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/01/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/01/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/21/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 06/05/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/20/1990