Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/06/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/17/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/21/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/19/1990