Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/31/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 01/31/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/06/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/21/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/03/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/18/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/17/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/26/1990