Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 01/31/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 02/06/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/06/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/06/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/06/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/06/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/21/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/21/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/20/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/20/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/03/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/03/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/03/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/18/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 04/18/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 05/01/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/01/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/08/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/08/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/09/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/17/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/24/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/24/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/07/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/26/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/12/1990