Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/31/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 01/31/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/21/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/20/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/12/1990