Refine your search

Refined by:

Oklahoma Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 02/06/1990
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/20/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/21/1990