Refine your search

Refined by:

Oregon Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/01/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/12/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/20/1990