Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 01/31/1990
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 01/31/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/06/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/06/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/21/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/06/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/03/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/18/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/18/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/01/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/09/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/24/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/20/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/20/1990