Refine your search

Refined by:

South Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/20/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 04/18/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/11/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/11/1990