Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/21/1990
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/06/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/06/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/03/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/03/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/04/1990
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/18/1990
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/18/1990
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 04/18/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/21/1990
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/19/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/23/1990