Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/31/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/31/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 02/06/1990
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 02/06/1990
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/06/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/21/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/21/1990