Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/31/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 02/06/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/20/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 05/01/1990