Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/03/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/17/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/21/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/20/1990
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 08/01/1990