Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/31/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 01/31/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/31/1990
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/31/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 02/06/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 02/06/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/06/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/06/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 02/06/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/06/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 02/06/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/21/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/21/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 02/21/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/06/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/06/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/06/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/06/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 03/20/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/20/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 03/20/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/20/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 03/20/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/20/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 03/20/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 03/20/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/03/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/03/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/03/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/03/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/03/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 04/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/03/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/03/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/03/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/03/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/04/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/04/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/18/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/18/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/18/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 05/01/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/01/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 05/01/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 05/01/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/01/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 05/01/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 05/01/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/01/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/02/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/08/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/08/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/08/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/08/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/09/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/17/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/17/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/17/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/21/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/21/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/21/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/24/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/24/1990
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/24/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/05/1990
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 06/05/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 06/05/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/05/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/05/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/07/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/07/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/07/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 06/11/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/19/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/20/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/26/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/26/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/12/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/20/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/20/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/20/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/20/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/12/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 09/12/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/12/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 09/12/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/12/1990