There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Urgent Assistance for Democracy in Panama Act of 1990

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Urgent Assistance for Democracy in Panama Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize certain United States assistance and trade benefits for Panama, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/14/1990Became Public Law No: 101-243.
02/14/1990Signed by President.
02/09/1990Presented to President.
02/07/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2073 without amendment by Voice Vote.
02/07/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
02/07/1990Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-401, Part II.
02/07/1990Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 101-401, Part I.
02/06/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
02/15/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
02/15/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade, and Monetary Policy.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
02/14/1990Became Public Law No: 101-243.
02/14/1990Signed by President.
02/09/1990HousePresented to President.
02/08/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
02/07/1990SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 2073 without amendment by Voice Vote.
02/07/1990SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
02/07/1990SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
02/07/1990-1:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/07/1990-1:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
02/07/1990-12:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
02/07/1990-12:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
02/07/1990-12:58pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
02/07/1990-12:58pmHouseMr. Broomfield demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
02/07/1990-12:58pmHouseMr. Fascell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/07/1990HouseReported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-401, Part II.
02/07/1990HouseReported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 101-401, Part I.
02/06/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/06/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/06/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/06/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/06/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/06/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
02/06/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
02/06/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/06/1990HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/06/1990 Referred to
02/06/1990 Markup by
02/07/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-401 Part 1
House Appropriations02/06/1990 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs02/06/1990 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy02/15/1990 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance02/15/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/06/1990 Referred to
02/06/1990 Markup by
02/07/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-401 Part 2

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3952. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/1990)

Urgent Assistance for Democracy in Panama Act of 1990 - Title I: Panama - Authorizes funds to Panama for: (1) economic assistance programs; (2) certain guaranteed assistance relating to housing and trade credit insurance programs; and (3) certain law enforcement assistance (including military assistance).

Provides for the resumption of U.S. assistance to Panama under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and certain trade benefits under the Generalized System of Preferences and the Caribbean Basin Economic Recovery Act because of such country's cooperation in controlling narcotics trafficking.

Title II: Eastern Europe and Yugoslavia - Authorizes the use of certain funds under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 relating to the economic support fund to support the democratization in East European countries and Yugoslavia.