Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 02/06/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/01/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/01/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/01/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/01/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/01/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/01/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/01/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/01/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/01/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/01/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/01/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/01/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/01/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/01/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/01/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/01/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/01/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/01/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/01/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/01/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/01/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/01/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/01/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/01/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/01/1990
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 05/01/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/12/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/12/1990
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/12/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/12/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/12/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/12/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/12/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 07/12/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/12/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/12/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/12/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/12/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/12/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/12/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/12/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/12/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/12/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/12/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/12/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/12/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/12/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/12/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/12/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/12/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/27/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/27/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/27/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/27/1990
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 07/27/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/27/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/27/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/27/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/27/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/27/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/27/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/27/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/27/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/27/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/27/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/13/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 09/13/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/13/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/13/1990