Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 02/06/1990
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/07/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/07/1990
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/14/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 03/14/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/14/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/14/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/14/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/14/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/14/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/14/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/14/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/14/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/14/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/14/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/14/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/14/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/14/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/14/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 03/14/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/14/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/14/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/14/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/14/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/14/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/27/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/27/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/27/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/28/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/03/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 04/19/1990