Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 02/07/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 02/07/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/18/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 04/18/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/18/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/18/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/18/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/18/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/18/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/18/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/18/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/18/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/18/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/18/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/09/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 05/09/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/09/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/09/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/09/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/07/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/07/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/07/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/07/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/07/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/26/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/26/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/26/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/26/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/26/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/23/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/23/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/1990