There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Director of the Geological Survey to conduct a study of the water quality of the Mississippi River.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
11/05/1990Provisions Included In H.R.5769.
03/13/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Offshore Energy Resources.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/20/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 02/07/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 02/07/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/10/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/07/1990 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water, Power and Offshore Energy Resources03/13/1990 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation02/07/1990 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Water Resources02/20/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3985. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/1990)

Requires the Director of the Geological Survey to conduct a study of the water quality of the Mississippi River.

Authorizes appropriations.