There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Close-Captioned Television in Public Facilities Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require that certain Federal entities and certain non-Federal entities receiving Federal financial assistance provide television sets capable of displaying closed-captioning, to prohibit Federal funding of conferences held at certain places of public accomodation which do not provide guests with guest rooms furnished with televisions capable of displaying closed-captioning, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
02/28/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/28/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/28/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/26/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
02/23/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/12/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/07/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/12/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/07/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/23/1990 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/07/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor02/07/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education02/28/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education02/28/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education02/28/1990 Referred to
House Government Operations02/07/1990 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation02/26/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3993.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3993. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/1990)

Closed-Captioned Television in Public Facilities Act of 1990 - Amends part A (General Provisions) of title XI of the Social Security Act to permit participation in the Medicaid and Medicare programs only to hospitals which certify that each patient is provided, upon request, with a room furnished with a television capable of displaying closed-captioning and that notice of this service is given to the patient at the time of admission. Exempts hospitals that do not make televisions available to patients.

Institutes comparable requirements for nursing care facilities and intermediate care facilities for the mentally retarded, requiring that televisions in common areas of the relevant facility be capable of displaying closed-captioning.

Amends the Public Health Service Act and other Federal law to institute the same requirements for Public Health Service facilities and for hospitals, nursing homes, and domiciliary facilities under the direct jurisdiction of the Veterans Administration (effective March 1989, Department of Veterans Affairs).

Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require institutions of higher education and vocational schools, in order to be eligible for student assistance programs, to certify that televisions capable of displaying closed-captioning are available for use in classrooms and common areas, unless the Secretary of Education determines that waiver or modification is appropriate.

Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to require any local educational agency conducting programs that include television program viewing to certify that the televisions used are capable of displaying closed-captioning unless the Secretary of Education determines that waiver or modification is appropriate.

Directs all Federal entities that use television or video programming to provide public information or educational services to make reasonable efforts to caption the programming and make it available to the general public and to organizations that serve the hearing-impaired.

Prohibits Federal funding of conferences, seminars, or similar activities held in a public lodging establishment that does not, upon request, provide guests with rooms furnished with televisions capable of displaying closed-captioning. Permits the Secretary of the Treasury to waive this prohibition if the entity sponsoring or funding the event certifies that the waiver would be appropriate.

Requires federally funded or federally sponsored public service announcements to be closed-captioned.