There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Pay Reform Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To defer congressional pay adjustments until the first March 1 following the beginning of the Congress next following the Congress during which certain actions with respect to pay rates are taken, to provide that appropriations of funds for congressional pay be considered separately from appropriations for other purposes, to require a recorded vote in each House on such appropriations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/03/1989Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/1989Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 01/03/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 01/19/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/19/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/19/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/19/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/19/1989
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/19/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 01/19/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 01/19/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 01/19/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 01/19/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/19/1989
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 01/19/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/19/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/19/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 01/19/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 01/19/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 01/24/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 01/24/1989
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 01/24/1989
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/24/1989
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 01/24/1989
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/24/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/24/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/24/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/27/1989
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 01/27/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 01/27/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 01/27/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 01/27/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 01/27/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 01/27/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 01/27/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 01/27/1989
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 01/27/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/27/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/27/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/02/1989
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/02/1989
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 02/02/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 02/02/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/02/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/02/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/02/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/02/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/02/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 02/02/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/02/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 02/02/1989
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/1989
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 02/02/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/02/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 02/07/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/07/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 02/07/1989
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/07/1989
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 02/07/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/07/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/07/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/08/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/08/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/11/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/28/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service01/03/1989 Referred to
House Rules01/03/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.401.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.401. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/1989)

Congressional Pay Reform Act of 1987 - Amends the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 to specify that pay adjustments for Members of Congress shall become effective on March 1 following the beginning of the next Congress after the Congress during which such adjustment is approved.

Amends the Federal Salary Act to require the President to transmit to the Congress, within a specified time period, recommendations for rates of pay of Members of Congress and legislative and judicial employees. (Currently such recommendations are included in the Federal budget.)

Prohibits the House of Representatives and the Senate from considering any bill or joint resolution carrying an appropriation for compensation of Members of Congress for any fiscal year if it carries an appropriation, or a limitation of appropriations, for any other purpose. Requires a recorded vote on such bill or resolution.