There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Disaster Preparedness Inventory Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require that the Director of the Federal Emergency Management Agency conduct an inventory of resources available to the Federal Government for use in response to a natural disaster.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/21/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/14/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
03/14/1990Executive Comment Requested from FEMA, OMB.
02/21/1990Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/21/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/21/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 02/21/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/14/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/03/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/14/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation02/21/1990 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Water Resources03/14/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4065.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4065. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/21/1990)

National Disaster Preparedness Inventory Act of 1990 - Amends the Disaster Relief Act of 1974 to require the Director of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to: (1) establish the Committee on Standards to identify resources and establish standards for those resources needed to provide relief and assist in search and rescue operations following a major disaster or emergency; (2) inventory resources identified by the Committee that are available to the Federal Government for such uses in a manner as to facilitate the dispatch of resources on a regional basis; (3) make the inventory available to the Governor of each State for requesting Federal assistance after a major disaster or emergency; (4) prepare a plan to deploy such resources to major disaster or emergency sites following the declaration of such by the President; and (5) request all Governors to identify the public safety officials responsible for coordinating or overseeing State and local responses to disasters and emergencies. Requires such officials to have direct and immediate access to information in the inventory to expedite State and local responses to disasters and emergencies not declared as such by the President.