There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Educational and Vocational Counseling Amendments of 1990

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Educational and Vocational Counseling Amendments of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, with respect to educational and vocational counseling for veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/10/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/27/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-563.
02/22/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/15/1990HouseSimiliar Provisions Included In H.R.1199 (Section 205).
07/11/1990SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
07/10/1990-1:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/10/1990-1:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/10/1990-1:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/10/1990-1:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/10/1990-1:01pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
07/10/1990-1:01pmHouseMr. Stump demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
07/10/1990-1:00pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/27/1990HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 349.
06/27/1990HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-563.
05/03/1990HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
05/03/1990HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
03/08/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/08/1990HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
02/22/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/22/1990HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/22/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/13/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/13/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/13/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/13/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/13/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 06/13/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/13/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/13/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/13/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/13/1990
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/13/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/13/1990
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/13/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/13/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/13/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/13/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/13/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 06/13/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/13/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/13/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/13/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/13/1990
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 06/13/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/13/1990
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/13/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/13/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/22/1990 Referred to
06/27/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-563
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment03/08/1990 Referred to
03/08/1990 Hearings by
05/03/1990 Markup by
05/03/1990 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/11/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4089.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4089. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/10/1990)

Veterans Educational and Vocational Counseling Amendments of 1990 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide educational and vocational counseling and related services to: (1) individuals eligible for educational assistance under the armed forces educational assistance program; (2) individuals discharged or released from active duty under conditions other than dishonorable within the past year; and (3) individuals serving on active duty and within 180 days from being released or discharged under conditions other than dishonorable.

Requires the Secretary to make available information concerning the need for general education and for trained personnel in the various crafts, trades, and professions. Requires the Secretary to acquaint all eligible individuals with the availability of counseling services offered under this Act.

Provides entitlement for a veterans' rehabilitation program for persons receiving outpatient medical care or treatment for a service-connected disability pending discharge from active military service when the Secretary has determined that the hospital providing such care or treatment is under contract with or under the jurisdiction of the Secretary or the Secretary of the military department concerned.

Includes the payment of handling fees by the Secretary as part of the scope and services authorized to be provided to a veterans' rehabilitation program.

Authorizes the payment of a subsistence allowance to veterans pursuing a vocational rehabilitation program in a Federal, State, or local governmental agency. (Currently, such allowance is offered only to veterans pursuing a program at the Federal level.)

Repeals certain reporting requirements concerning post-Vietnam era veterans' educational assistance and education loan defaults.

Authorizes the Secretary to suspend, terminate, reduce, or make a final denial of any financial assistance or payment under either a veterans' or an armed forces' educational assistance program or take other adverse action based on information produced by a matching program with the Department of Defense. Requires the Secretary, before taking any such action, to provide the individual involved with written notice of the findings of the Secretary based on the matching program and of the individual's right to contest the findings within ten days.

Ratifies, from July 2, 1990, to the enactment of this Act, the use by the Department of Veterans Affairs of any category of information provided by the Department or the Department of Defense for making military service status determinations of persons receiving veterans' or armed forces' educational assistance.

Delays the effective date of the Computer Matching and Privacy Protection Act of 1988 with respect to certain education benefits computer matching programs between DOD and the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Entitles to basic educational assistance those military personnel who, after completion of the minimum required period of active duty, are placed on the retired list, transferred to the Fleet Reserve or Fleet Marine Corps Reserve, or are placed on the temporary disability retired list after being discharged from active duty under honorable conditions.