Committees: H.R.4115 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/27/1990 Referred to
04/18/1990 Markup by
06/05/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-519 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Oceanography03/07/1990 Referred to
04/04/1990 Markup by
04/04/1990 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment03/07/1990 Referred to
04/04/1990 Markup by
04/04/1990 Reported by
House Science, Space and Technology06/12/1990 Referred to
08/01/1990 Markup by
08/30/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-519 Part 2
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research and Environment06/13/1990 Referred to
07/27/1990 Markup by
07/27/1990 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/26/1990 Referred to