There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Breast and Cervical Cancer Mortality Prevention Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a program of grants for the prevention and control of breast and cervical cancer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/08/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/10/1990Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
05/10/1990Clean Bill, H.R. 4790 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
04/23/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
03/21/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/08/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/08/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/04/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/24/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/24/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/08/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/21/1990 Referred to
04/23/1990 Hearings by
05/10/1990 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4222. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/1990)

Breast and Cervical Cancer Mortality Prevention Act of 1990 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services, through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control, to make grants to States, with regard to breast and cervical cancer, for screening, referrals and follow-up services, public information and education programs, education and training for health professionals, quality monitoring of screening, and evaluations of such activities. Sets forth preferences in making the grants and requires equitable geographical distribution. Requires matching non-Federal funds in a specified ratio.

Requires that States agree to: (1) provide all of certain services by a specified date; (2) switch to any improved screening procedures which become available; and (3) assure the quality of any screening procedures used.

Directs the Secretary to establish guidelines for assuring the quality of mammography and cytological screening conducted under these provisions.

Requires that low-income women be given priority in the provision of services. Requires that a charge for services, if any: (1) be made according to a public schedule; (2) be adjusted for income of the woman involved; and (3) not be imposed on women with incomes below the poverty line. Requires services to be provided throughout a State, including to members of any Indian tribe or tribal organization.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide training and technical assistance. Directs the Secretary to provide for annual evaluations of programs carried out under this Act.

Authorizes appropriations.

Limits the number of grants made to seven in FY 1991.