Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 01/03/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 01/27/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/27/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/27/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/27/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/27/1989
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/27/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/27/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 01/27/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/02/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 02/02/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/02/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/02/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/21/1989
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/21/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/21/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/21/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 02/21/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/21/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/21/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/21/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/21/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/21/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 03/02/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 03/02/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/02/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/02/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/02/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/15/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/15/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/11/1989
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 04/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/02/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/22/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/12/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/06/1989
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/06/1989