There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Comprehensive Preventive Health Program For Medicare Beneficiaries.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/18/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/19/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/14/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 03/14/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 03/14/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 03/14/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 03/20/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/20/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/22/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/22/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/24/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/24/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 04/24/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/26/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/26/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/26/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/26/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/26/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/26/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 04/26/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/26/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/26/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/26/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/08/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/08/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/08/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/08/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/08/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 05/08/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/08/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 05/08/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/08/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/15/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/15/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/15/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/15/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 05/15/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/15/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/15/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/15/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/05/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/17/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/17/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/17/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/17/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/20/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/20/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/20/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/20/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/20/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/20/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/30/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 07/30/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/30/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/30/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/30/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/26/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/26/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/26/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/26/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/22/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/22/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/22/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/14/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/19/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/14/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/18/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4269.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4269. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/1990)

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to cover colon cancer preventive screening examinations, an annual physical examination performed by a physician or nurse practitioner, and verbal and written mental health screening examinations if a demonstration project to be conducted by the Secretary of Health and Human Services proves such examinations to be cost-effective or of moderate cost but measurably health enhancing.