Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 03/15/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/15/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/15/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 03/15/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/15/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 03/15/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/15/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/16/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 05/16/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/16/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/16/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/16/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/16/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/16/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/16/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/16/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/16/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/16/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/16/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/24/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/24/1990
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 07/24/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/24/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/24/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/24/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/24/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/24/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/13/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/13/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 10/19/1990