Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/20/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/03/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/03/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/03/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/03/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/15/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/15/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/15/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/15/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/15/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/22/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/22/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/22/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/19/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 06/19/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 07/24/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/24/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/24/1990