Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 04/04/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/04/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/02/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/02/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/02/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/02/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/02/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/02/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 05/02/1990
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/02/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/02/1990
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/02/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/02/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/02/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/02/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/02/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/02/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/02/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/02/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/02/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/08/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/08/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/08/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/08/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/23/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 05/23/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/23/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/23/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/23/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/23/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/23/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/11/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/11/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/11/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/30/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/30/1990