Committees: H.R.45 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/1989 Referred to
07/28/1989 Markup by
09/19/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-244 Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law03/27/1989 Referred to
05/25/1989 Markup by
05/25/1989 Reported by
House Rules01/03/1989 Referred to
10/17/1989 Hearings by
10/17/1989 Markup by
10/19/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-244 Part 2
House Rules Subcommittee on Rules of the House05/05/1989 Referred to
10/17/1989 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/27/1989 Referred to
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs11/03/1989 Referred to