There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to disregard reparation payments from the Federal Republic of Germany from the post-eligibility computation of income for individuals who are institutionalized or receiving home or community-based services.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/04/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/23/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/04/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/09/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/09/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/09/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/09/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/09/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/09/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/09/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/09/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/09/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/09/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/09/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/09/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 05/09/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/24/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/24/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/24/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/24/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/24/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/24/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/24/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/07/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/14/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/14/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/12/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/12/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/12/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/18/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 07/18/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/18/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/18/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 07/18/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/31/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/31/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 07/31/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/31/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/31/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/31/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/31/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/31/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/31/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/31/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/17/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/04/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/23/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4516.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4516. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/04/1990)

Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to disregard reparation payments made by the Federal Republic of Germany in the post-eligibility computation of income for individuals who reside in nursing homes or receive home- or community-based services.