There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeless Outreach Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Health and Human Service to provide intensive outreach and other services and protections to homeless individuals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/18/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/27/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/23/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/23/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/23/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
04/18/1990Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 04/18/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/25/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/08/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/08/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/08/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/16/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/16/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/16/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/16/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/12/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/20/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/20/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/21/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/21/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/27/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/27/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/27/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/28/1990
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/10/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/10/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/12/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/12/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/31/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/13/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/21/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/21/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/21/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/27/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/20/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/20/1990

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/18/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security04/23/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources04/23/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/18/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/27/1990 Referred to
House Agriculture04/18/1990 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition04/23/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4548.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4548. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/1990)

Homeless Outreach Act of 1990 - Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to conduct an outreach program which assists homeless persons in applying for, receiving, and maintaining Social Security Act benefits. Sets forth the scope of such program, requiring: (1) regular visits by outreach personnel to places frequented by the homeless to inform the homeless of, and actively assist them in, applying for benefits; (2) active measures to prevent the inappropriate suspension of benefits to individuals who are homeless, mentally impaired or otherwise unaware of the significance of appealing negative benefit determinations; (3) the immediate restoration of inappropriately suspended benefits; and (4) a final decision on the benefit application of a homeless person within 30 days of its receipt.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide: (1) the assistance that may be necessary to ensure that homeless persons appropriately use Social Security Act benefits; and (2) grants to States, local governments, and nonprofit organizations to conduct outreach programs for the homeless.