There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend temporarily the duty on pigment green 36.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/09/1990Executive Comment Received from ITC.
05/16/1990Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, ITC, USTR.
04/30/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/25/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/25/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/30/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4615.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4615. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/1990)

Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to suspend, through December 31, 1992, the duty on poly-chloro-bromo coppet phthalocyanine (also known as pigment green 36).