There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mickey Leland Peace Dividend Housing Assistance Act of 1990

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Community Housing Partnership Act
  • Recycling of Existing Assets for Cost-Effective Housing Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To alleviate homelessness, reduce housing cost burdens, and increase housing opportunities for low-income families, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/01/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
04/25/1990Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 04/25/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 04/25/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/25/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/03/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/03/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/03/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/16/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/16/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/16/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/16/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/13/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/13/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/13/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/13/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/11/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/11/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/02/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 08/02/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/12/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/12/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/12/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/12/1990
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 10/12/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs04/25/1990 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development05/01/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4621.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4621. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/1990)

Mickey Leland Peace Dividend Housing Assistance Act of 1990 - Title I: Housing for Low-Income Families - Increases FY 1991 through 1995 budget authority for Housing Act of 1937 section 8 existing housing certificates.

Amends such Act to revise section 8 tenant selection preferences, including annual reevaluation of family preference.

Requires the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to submit semiannual assisted housing reports to the Congress. Authorizes appropriations.

Title II: Community Housing Partnership - Community Housing Partnership Act - Subtitle A: Housing Education and Organizational Support Grants for Community Based Housing Projects - Authorizes the Secretary to provide housing education and organizational support grants to eligible cities and States and directly to nonprofit sponsors and nonprofit organizations.

Subtitle B: Community Housing Partnership Grants - Authorizes the Secretary to provide grants to cities and States and grants and loans to nonprofit sponsors for acquisition, construction, and rehabilitation of low- and moderate-income housing.

Allocates community partnership housing grants as follows: (1) 60 percent to metropolitan and urban areas; (2) 25 percent to States for non-urban use; and (3) 15 percent to nonprofit sponsors.

Subtitle C: General Provisions - Defines specified terms for purposes of this title.

Authorizes appropriations for subtitle A.

Title III: Recycling of Existing Federal Assets - Recycling of Existing Assets for Cost-Effective Housing Act - Authorizes the Secretary to make grants to States for State housing finance agencies to establish revolving funds for low- to moderate-income rental housing. Requires State matching funds.

Requires: (1) States receiving such funds to establish a revolving fund; and (2) agencies to develop affirmative action programs.

Sets forth requirements with regard to: (1) rental housing; and (2) eligible properties.

Authorizes appropriations.

Title IV: Public Housing Development and Modernization - Increases FY 1991 through 1995 budget authority under the Housing Act of 1937 for: (1) public housing development; and public housing modernization.

Amends such Act to revise public housing tenant selection criteria, including annual reevaluation of family preference.

Title V: Grants for Preservation of Existing Housing and Security in Public Housing - Authorizes the Secretary to make grants for: (1) acquisition and rehabilitation of specified multifamily housing; (2) training and technical assistance to nonprofit sponsors and representative organizations; and (3) public housing security, including Indian public housing. Authorizes appropriations.

Title VI: Rural Housing Program Funding - Increases FY 1991 through 1995 budget authority under the Housing Act of 1949 for the following rural housing programs: (1) homeownership loan program; (2) very low-income housing repair loan program; (3) farm labor housing loan program; (4) rural rental housing loan program; (5) farm labor housing grant program; (6) housing preservation grant program; and (7) rental assistance payments program.

Extends program authority for: (1) rental housing loans; and (2) rural area classification.

Title VII: Supportive Services - Directs the Secretary to carry out a program to coordinate supportive services in federally assisted housing, including such services as: (1) child care; (2) health monitoring; (3) education and job training; and (4) drug and alcohol counseling.

Title VIII: Single Room Occupancy Housing for Homeless Families and Individuals - Increases FY 1991 through 1995 budget authority under the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act for section 8 assistance for single room occupancy dwellings.

Amends such Act to extend single room occupancy contract authority.

Title IX: Miscellaneous - Directs the Comptroller General to audit the Secretary at least annually with respect to activities under this Act, and report to the Congress.