Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 04/25/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 04/25/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/25/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 04/25/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/25/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/03/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/03/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/03/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/16/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/16/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/16/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/16/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/13/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/13/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/13/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/13/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/11/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/11/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/02/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 08/02/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/12/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/12/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/12/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/12/1990
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 10/12/1990