Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 05/01/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/01/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/03/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/03/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/03/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/03/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/03/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 05/03/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/03/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/03/1990
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 05/03/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/03/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/03/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 05/03/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 05/03/1990
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/03/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/03/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/03/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/03/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/03/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 05/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 05/03/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/03/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/03/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/03/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/03/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/03/1990
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/03/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 05/03/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/03/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/03/1990
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/03/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/03/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/03/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/03/1990
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/03/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/03/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 05/03/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/10/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/10/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/10/1990
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/10/1990
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/10/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/10/1990
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/10/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 05/10/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/10/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/10/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 05/10/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/10/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/10/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/10/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/10/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 05/10/1990
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/10/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/10/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/10/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 05/10/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/10/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/10/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/10/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 05/17/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/17/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/17/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/17/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/17/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/17/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/17/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/17/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/17/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 05/17/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/17/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 05/17/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/05/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 06/05/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/05/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/05/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/05/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 06/21/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 06/21/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/21/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/28/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/28/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/28/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 06/28/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/28/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/28/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/28/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/28/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 07/20/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/20/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/20/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 07/20/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 08/03/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/11/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 10/16/1990