There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Small Business Enhancement Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the formation and growth of small businesses in rural areas and assist in the economic development of such areas.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/15/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
11/15/1990See H.R.4793 (Title III).
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/14/1990Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/14/1990Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy, and Minority Enterprise Developme Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/14/1990Subcommittee on Procurement, Tourism, and Rural Development Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
05/29/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
05/29/1990Executive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
05/21/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation Credit and Rural Development.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/17/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy, and Minority Enterprise Development.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
05/17/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Procurement, Tourism, and Rural Development.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
05/15/1990Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1990Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1990Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/15/1990 Referred to
06/14/1990 Hearings by
House Small Business Subcommittee on Procurement, Tourism, and Rural Development05/17/1990 Referred to
06/14/1990 Discharged from
House Small Business Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy and Minority Enterprise Development05/17/1990 Referred to
06/14/1990 Discharged from
House Public Works and Transportation05/15/1990 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation05/29/1990 Referred to
House Agriculture05/15/1990 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development05/21/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4816.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4816. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/1990)

Rural Small Business Enhancement Act of 1990 - Title I: Loan Programs - Amends the Small Business Act to direct the Administrator of Small Business to make loans to rural economic development entities which must use them for: (1) the creation and expansion of business concerns; and (2) rural small business incubators. Prescribes lending guidelines. Authorizes appropriations.

Title II: Rural Small Business Investment Companies - Modifies the capital requirements for certain companies licensed to assist rural small business concerns. Authorizes paid-in capital to include contributions by State and local governments and nonprofit institutions.

Title III: Technical Assistance for Rural Small Business Concerns - Establishes an Office of Rural Affairs (the Office) in the Small Business Administration to be headed by an Associate Administrator who shall: (1) ensure that rural small businesses receive a percentage of financial assistance representative of the population and economic needs in their areas; (2) compile specified rural business statistics; and (3) disseminate information regarding sources of assistance.

Mandates that rural area statistics compiled by the Office be included in the President's annual report on small business and competition.

Directs the Administrator to: (1) make grants to rural economic development entities to fund a portion of the salaries and expenses of rural technical assistance specialists; (2) report to the Congress regarding the effectiveness of such grants; (3) make marketing assistance grants for rural small businesses; and (4) make grants to assist marketing studies regarding tourism promotion in rural areas. Authorizes appropriations. Sets forth matching grant requirements.

Title IV: Infrastructure Improvement - Amends the Surface Transportation and Uniform Relocation Assistance Act of 1987 to increase the authorization for rural Federal-aid highways.

Mandates that each State conduct a rural scenic byways preservation and improvement program with Federal amounts apportioned for construction projects on such byways. Outlines funding guidelines. Authorizes appropriations.

Title V: National Commission on Rural America - Establishes the National Commission on Rural America to evaluate and report to the Congress on specified aspects of the Federal rural assistance program. Terminates the Commission after it submits such report.

Title VI: Research and Reporting Requirements - Directs the Administration to study and report to the Congress on methods to: (1) assist rural small businesses to obtain Government contracts; and (2) expand the export of goods and services provided by such businesses.

Directs the Administrator to compile and distribute to the public and the Congress a catalog of Federal rural small business assistance programs.