Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 05/17/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/17/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/17/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/17/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/21/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 05/21/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/21/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 06/12/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/12/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 06/12/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/13/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/13/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/13/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/13/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/14/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/19/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/19/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/19/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/28/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 06/28/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/28/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/11/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/11/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/18/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/10/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/17/1990